PA SB9 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-15 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-15 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.
Title
An Act requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-15 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2008-04-09 | Final passage | |
2008-04-09 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2008-04-09 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-04-08 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-04-07 | Amended on second consideration | |
2008-03-31 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-03-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-02-12 | First consideration | |
2008-02-12 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=9 |