PA SB898 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-10-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, providing for school access to emergency epinephrine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school health services, providing for school access to emergency epinephrine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-10-07SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2014-09-23SenateFirst consideration
2014-09-23SenateReported as amended
2013-05-31SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback