PA SB890 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 26, 2001 (P.L.755, No.77), known as the Tobacco Settlement Act, in medical assistance for workers with disabilities, further providing for definitions and for medical assistance benefits for workers with disabilities and workers with medically improved disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In medical assistance for workers with disabilities, further providing for definitions and for medical assistance benefits for workers with disabilities and workers with medically improved disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 890 PN 1814, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07HouseReferred to HEALTH
2020-10-05HouseIn the House
2020-10-05SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-09-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-29SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-23SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-23SenateReported as amended
2019-10-08SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=890
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0890&pn=1246
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0890&pn=1814
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=1007
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/21/2020&RollCallId=1138
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=652

Bill Comments

feedback