PA SB890 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge carrying State Route 6011 (Harrison Avenue) over Roaring Brook in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County, as the Colonel Frank Duffy Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge carrying State Route 6011 (Harrison Avenue) over Roaring Brook in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County, as the Colonel Frank Duffy Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 890 PN 1041, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 890 PN 1041, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 890 PN 1041, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 890 PN 1041, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | House | Act No. 56 |
2015-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-10-21 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2015-10-20 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-07 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-05 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-07-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-07-13 | House | In the House |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |