PA SB888 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 888 PN 1998, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Floor: SB 888 PN 1998, FP (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A09234 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 888 PN 1242, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 144
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-16SenateSigned in House
2018-10-15SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-12SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-10-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (177-0)
2018-10-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-10HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-10HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as amended
2017-10-18HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-10-17HouseIn the House
2017-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-10-16SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-10-02SenateSecond consideration
2017-09-20SenateFirst consideration
2017-09-20SenateReported as committed
2017-09-15SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=888
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0888&pn=1154
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0888&pn=1242
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0888&pn=1998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=09/20/2017&RollCallId=449
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1912
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1911
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1541
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/11/2018&RollCallId=2058
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1184

Bill Comments

feedback