PA SB881 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 881 PN 2198, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 881 PN 2198, FP (Y: 187 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 881 PN 2141, 2015 A10851, CARROLL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A10483 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 881 PN 1604, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 881 PN 2198, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 881 PN 2198, FP (Y: 187 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 881 PN 2141, 2015 A10851, CARROLL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A10483 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 881 PN 1604, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | Act No. 154 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-3) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2016-10-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2016-04-04 | House | In the House |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |