PA SB865 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 36020, on that portion on Pennsylvania Route 66, known as Main Street, over the Norfolk Southern Railway, City of Greensburg, Westmoreland County, as the Sergeant Richard Ivory Cullen Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 36020, on that portion on Pennsylvania Route 66, known as Main Street, over the Norfolk Southern Railway, City of Greensburg, Westmoreland County, as the Sergeant Richard Ivory Cullen Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 865 PN 1056, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 865 PN 1056, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-10-25 | House | In the House |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |