PA SB862 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in primary and election expenses, further providing for residual funds.
Title
In primary and election expenses, further providing for residual funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |