PA SB861 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, providing for coverage obligations of loaner vehicles.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, providing for coverage obligations of loaner vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: SB 861 PN 978, 2015 A2710, COSTA, D. (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 861 PN 978, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 861 PN 978, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-12-01 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2015-06-17 | House | In the House |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |