PA SB860 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for duties of the Department of Corrections and the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, for educating and training of government-funded professionals who come into contact with individuals engaged in risky substance use and for training programs to educate physicians and nonphysicians in addressing risky substance use and addiction; developing screening and assessment instruments for addictive substances; requiring treatment programs and providers to utilize evidence-based prevention and treatment approaches; and providing for screening at the time of arraignment.
Title
Providing for duties of the Department of Corrections and the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, for educating and training of government-funded professionals who come into contact with individuals engaged in risky substance use and for training programs to educate physicians and nonphysicians in addressing risky substance use and addiction; developing screening and assessment instruments for addictive substances; requiring treatment programs and providers to utilize evidence-based prevention and treatment approaches; and providing for screening at the time of arraignment.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |