PA SB859 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Act No. 80 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Act No. 80 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for enforcement of failure to stop for school bus with flashing red lights.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for enforcement of failure to stop for school bus with flashing red lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Floor: SB 859 PN 1052, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 859 PN 1052, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Floor: SB 859 PN 1052, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 859 PN 1052, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | Act No. 80 of 2021 |
2021-10-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-10-06 | House | Signed in House |
2021-10-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-10-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-05 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-05 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-29 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-28 | House | In the House |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |