PA SB859 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 22, 1978 (P.L.1166, No.274), referred to as the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency Law, further providing for the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; and establishing the Mental Health and Justice Advisory Committee and the Mental Health and Justice Grant Program.
Title
Further providing for the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; and establishing the Mental Health and Justice Advisory Committee and the Mental Health and Justice Grant Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |