PA SB857 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for telemedicine, authorizing the regulation of telemedicine by professional licensing boards and providing for insurance coverage of telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for telemedicine, authorizing the regulation of telemedicine by professional licensing boards and providing for insurance coverage of telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: SB 857 PN 1388, FP (Y: 111 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 857 PN 1388, MOT REV PRIOR PR, HARRIS (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 857 PN 1388, 2019 A3992, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 92 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03871 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 857 PN 1347, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-11-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (111-77)
2019-11-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as amended
2019-10-31HouseReferred to INSURANCE
2019-10-30HouseIn the House
2019-10-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-1)
2019-10-30SenateAmended on third consideration
2019-10-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-29SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-28SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-28SenateReported as amended
2019-09-19SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=857
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0857&pn=1170
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0857&pn=1326
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0857&pn=1347
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0857&pn=1388
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=10/28/2019&RollCallId=575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=592
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=320
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1348
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1349
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=881
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=917
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=1451

Bill Comments

feedback