PA SB857 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-29 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-29 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and prescribing penalties.
Title
In contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and prescribing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Charles McIlhinney [R] |
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 857 PN 970, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-29 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2015-10-27 | House | In the House |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |