PA SB851 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 57053, located over Dixon Run at the intersection of State Route 1012 to Pennsylvania Route 403 in Green Township, Indiana County, as the PVT William L. Hadden Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 57053, located over Dixon Run at the intersection of State Route 1012 to Pennsylvania Route 403 in Green Township, Indiana County, as the PVT William L. Hadden Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 851 PN 1046, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 851 PN 1046, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-09 | House | In the House |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |