PA SB850 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole), of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in authorized disposition of offenders, further providing for sentence for murder, murder of unborn child and murder of law enforcement officer and providing for sentence of persons under the age of 18 for murder, murder of an unborn child and murder of a law enforcement officer; in criminal history record information, further providing for expungement and for juvenile records; and providing for crime victims; in juvenile matters, further providing for short title and purposes of chapter, for definitions, for scope, for inspection of court files and records and for conduct of hearings; in sentencing, providing for sentencing for certain murders of infant persons and for sentences for second and subsequent offenses; in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for parole procedure.
Title
In authorized disposition of offenders, further providing for sentence for murder, murder of unborn child and murder of law enforcement officer and providing for sentence of persons under the age of 18 for murder, murder of an unborn child and murder of a law enforcement officer; in criminal history record information, further providing for expungement and for juvenile records; and providing for crime victims; in juvenile matters, further providing for short title and purposes of chapter, for definitions, for scope, for inspection of court files and records and for conduct of hearings; in sentencing, providing for sentencing for certain murders of infant persons and for sentences for second and subsequent offenses; in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for parole procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - Senate - SB 850 PN 2475, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 850 PN 2475, FP (Y: 174 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 850 PN 2475, MOT CONST, THOMAS (Y: 166 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 850, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 169 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13372, MULLERY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13372, MOT RECON, PERRY (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13649, SUSP RULES, THOMAS (Y: 77 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13372, MULLERY (Y: 101 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13354, MURPHY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13659, MARSICO (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13659, SUSP RULES, MARSICO (Y: 175 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13476, MARSICO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13361, MARSICO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-10-19 - Senate - SB 850 PN 1691, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 850 PN 2475, FP (Y: 174 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 850 PN 2475, MOT CONST, THOMAS (Y: 166 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 850, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 169 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13372, MULLERY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13372, MOT RECON, PERRY (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13649, SUSP RULES, THOMAS (Y: 77 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13372, MULLERY (Y: 101 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13354, MURPHY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13659, MARSICO (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13659, SUSP RULES, MARSICO (Y: 175 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13476, MARSICO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 850 PN 2418, 2011 A13361, MARSICO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-10-19 - Senate - SB 850 PN 1691, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | Senate | Act No. 204 |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (37-12) |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-10-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (174-20) |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-10-19 | House | In the House |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |