PA SB85 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Act No. 8 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Act No. 8 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, in district attorney, assistants and detectives, further providing for filling of vacancies.
Title
In district attorney, assistants and detectives, further providing for filling of vacancies.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: SB 85 PN 141, FP (Y: 181 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 85 PN 141, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: SB 85 PN 141, FP (Y: 181 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 85 PN 141, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Act No. 8 of 2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-03-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-03-23 | House | Signed in House |
2021-03-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (181-20) |
2021-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-17 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-02-05 | House | In the House |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |