PA SB848 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 27, 1905 (P.L.312, No.218), entitled "An act creating a Department of Health, and defining its powers and duties," further providing for the administrative structure of the Department of Health, establishing the office of Chief Nursing Officer of the Commonwealth and providing for the powers and duties of the Chief Nursing Officer of the Commonwealth.
Title
Amending the act of April 27, 1905 (P.L.312, No.218), entitled "An act creating a Department of Health, and defining its powers and duties," further providing for the administrative structure of the Department of Health, establishing the office of Chief Nursing Officer of the Commonwealth and providing for the powers and duties of the Chief Nursing Officer of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Robert Tomlinson [R] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 848 PN 1670, Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03158 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03158 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2022-05-23 | House | In the House |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (35-12) |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |