PA SB842 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for photo identification tag regulations.
Title
In licensing of health care facilities, further providing for photo identification tag regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 842 PN 1152, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 842 PN 1152, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 842 PN 1152, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 842 PN 1152, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 54 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-26 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2019-11-19 | House | In the House |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |