PA SB840 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Alzheimer's, Dementia and Related Disorders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Alzheimer's, Dementia and Related Disorders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 840 PN 1676, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended A04709 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-27HouseReferred to HEALTH
2024-06-27HouseIn the House
2024-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2024-06-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-06-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-06-11SenateSecond consideration
2024-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2024-06-04SenateReported as amended
2023-07-11SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=840
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0840&pn=1015
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0840&pn=1676
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0840&pn=1015&aYear=2023&an=04709
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/SB0840P1676.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=06/04/2024&RollCallId=938
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/26/2024&RollCallId=1123
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=551

Bill Comments

feedback