PA SB837 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of State Route 981 in Smithton Borough and South Huntingdon Township, Westmoreland County, as the Specialist 4 William J. Kolenc Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of State Route 981 in Smithton Borough and South Huntingdon Township, Westmoreland County, as the Specialist 4 William J. Kolenc Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 837 PN 1528, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: SB 837 PN 1528, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05757 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 837 PN 1099, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateAct No. 20
2018-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-05-01SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-30SenateSigned in House
2018-04-18SenateSigned in Senate
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2018-04-17SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-04-16SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2018-04-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-09HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-12HouseReported as amended
2017-11-16HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-11-14HouseIn the House
2017-11-14SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-13SenateRemoved from table
2017-11-13SenateLaid on the table
2017-11-13SenateSecond consideration
2017-09-20SenateFirst consideration
2017-09-20SenateReported as committed
2017-07-31SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=837
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0837&pn=1099
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0837&pn=1528
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=09/20/2017&RollCallId=447
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=339
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/12/2018&RollCallId=1325
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/12/2018&RollCallId=1324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1072
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/10/2018&RollCallId=1385
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=04/17/2018&RollCallId=769
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=460

Bill Comments

feedback