PA SB832 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 16, 1992 (P.L.155, No.28), known as the Assessors Certification Act, further providing for definitions and for duties of board; repealing provisions relating to qualifications; further providing for certification; providing for employees of political subdivisions; and further providing for disciplinary and correction measures and for unlawful practice.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for duties of board; repealing provisions relating to qualifications; further providing for certification; providing for employees of political subdivisions; and further providing for disciplinary and correction measures and for unlawful practice.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |