PA SB827 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Weigh Station Preclearance Program in the Pennsylvania State Police; and providing for criteria for preclearance system and devices and for data access.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Weigh Station Preclearance Program in the Pennsylvania State Police; and providing for criteria for preclearance system and devices and for data access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 827 PN 1009, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-27HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-10-26HouseIn the House
2021-10-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-10-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-09-28SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-09-28SenateSecond consideration
2021-09-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-09-22SenateReported as committed
2021-07-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback