PA SB827 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-11 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, enacting the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act (2015); providing for user direction and agreements, for disclosure of digital assets and electronic communications, for functions of fiduciaries and for compliance and immunity for custodians of digital assets and electronic communications; making conforming amendments; and providing for functions of the Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act (2015); providing for user direction and agreements, for disclosure of digital assets and electronic communications, for functions of fiduciaries and for compliance and immunity for custodians of digital assets and electronic communications; making conforming amendments; and providing for functions of the Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-10-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-24SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-09-19SenateFirst consideration
2017-09-19SenateReported as committed
2017-06-29SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback