PA SB819 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
Pending: House Aging & Older Adult Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 6, 1987 (P.L.381, No.79), known as the Older Adults Protective Services Act, extensively revising provisions on older adults protective services relating to preliminary provisions, administration, criminal history for employees, reporting suspected abuse by employees and miscellaneous provisions; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extensively revising provisions on older adults protective services relating to preliminary provisions, administration, criminal history for employees, reporting suspected abuse by employees and miscellaneous provisions; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 819 PN 1126, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-30HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2019-10-29HouseIn the House
2019-10-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-10-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-09-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-24SenateSecond consideration
2019-09-23SenateFirst consideration
2019-09-23SenateReported as committed
2019-08-07SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback