PA SB814 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for mandate waiver program.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for mandate waiver program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-03-28 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |