PA SB802 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in contracts, further providing for general regulations concerning contracts.
Title
In contracts, further providing for general regulations concerning contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 802 PN 1013, FP (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 802 PN 1013, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 802 PN 1013, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 141 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (181-0) |
2018-10-16 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-22 | House | In the House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |