PA SB8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 4 (Amusements), 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 30 (Fish), 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising forfeiture provisions as follows: in administration and enforcement relating to gaming, further providing for prohibited acts and penalties; in inchoate crimes, further providing for the offense of manufacture, distribution, use or possession of devices for theft of telecommunications services; in assault, further providing for the offense of terrorism; in loss of property rights relating to sexual offenses, further providing for general rule and repealing provisions relating to process and seizure, to custody of property and to disposal of property; in forgery and fraudulent practices, further providing for the offenses of copying and recording devices and for trademark counterfeiting; in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of gambling devices, gambling, etc.; in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for seizure and forfeiture of electronic, mechanical or other devices; in minors, further providing for sentencing and penalties for trafficking drugs to minors; in nuisances, further providing for the offense of scattering rubbish; in other offenses, further providing for drug trafficking sentencing and penalties; in vehicle chop shop and illegally obtained and altered property, further providing for loss of property rights to Commonwealth and repealing provisions relating to procedure with respect to seized property subject to liens and rights of lienholders; in enforcement relating to Fish and Boat Code, further providing for forfeiture of fish and devices; in actions, proceedings and other matters generally relating to Judicial Code, providing for forfeiture of assets; in forfeitures, repealing provisions relating to controlled substances forfeiture, to terrorism forfeiture and to procedure with respect to seized property subject to liens and rights of lienholders; in size, weight and load relating to Vehicle Code, further providing for transporting foodstuffs in vehicles used to transport waste; in liquid fuels and fuel use tax enforcement, further providing for forfeitures and process and procedures and for disposition of fines and forfeitures; providing for conduct of forfeiture; and making repeals of provisions of the Liquor Code and another act relating to certain forfeiture of property.
Title
Extensively revising forfeiture provisions as follows: in administration and enforcement relating to gaming, further providing for prohibited acts and penalties; in inchoate crimes, further providing for the offense of manufacture, distribution, use or possession of devices for theft of telecommunications services; in assault, further providing for the offense of terrorism; in loss of property rights relating to sexual offenses, further providing for general rule and repealing provisions relating to process and seizure, to custody of property and to disposal of property; in forgery and fraudulent practices, further providing for the offenses of copying and recording devices and for trademark counterfeiting; in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of gambling devices, gambling, etc.; in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for seizure and forfeiture of electronic, mechanical or other devices; in minors, further providing for sentencing and penalties for trafficking drugs to minors; in nuisances, further providing for the offense of scattering rubbish; in other offenses, further providing for drug trafficking sentencing and penalties; in vehicle chop shop and illegally obtained and altered property, further providing for loss of property rights to Commonwealth and repealing provisions relating to procedure with respect to seized property subject to liens and rights of lienholders; in enforcement relating to Fish and Boat Code, further providing for forfeiture of fish and devices; in actions, proceedings and other matters generally relating to Judicial Code, providing for forfeiture of assets; in forfeitures, repealing provisions relating to controlled substances forfeiture, to terrorism forfeiture and to procedure with respect to seized property subject to liens and rights of lienholders; in size, weight and load relating to Vehicle Code, further providing for transporting foodstuffs in vehicles used to transport waste; in liquid fuels and fuel use tax enforcement, further providing for forfeitures and process and procedures and for disposition of fines and forfeitures; providing for conduct of forfeiture; and making repeals of provisions of the Liquor Code and another act relating to certain forfeiture of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 8 PN 719, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, A986, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-0986 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, A984, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-0984 (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, A983, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-0983 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 8 PN 719, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, A986, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-0986 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, A984, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-0984 (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 8 PN 719, A983, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-0983 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Act No. 13 |
2017-06-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Signed in House |
2017-06-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-04-26 | House | In the House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-10) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |