PA SB798 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission, further providing for establishment and membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission, further providing for establishment and membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 798 PN 1078, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 798 PN 1078, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 139
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-16HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2018-10-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-01HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-06HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-06HouseReported as committed
2017-12-13HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-12-11HouseIn the House
2017-12-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-15SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-17SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-17SenateReported as committed
2017-07-07SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=798
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0798&pn=1078
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=470
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=1605
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=2065

Bill Comments

feedback