PA SB798 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission, further providing for establishment and membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission, further providing for establishment and membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 798 PN 1078, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-01HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-06HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-06HouseReported as committed
2017-12-13HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-12-11HouseIn the House
2017-12-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-15SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-17SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-17SenateReported as committed
2017-07-07SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback