PA SB791 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in township officers generally, further providing for removal for failure to perform duties.
Title
In township officers generally, further providing for removal for failure to perform duties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Floor: SB 791 PN 951, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 791 PN 951, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Floor: SB 791 PN 951, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 791 PN 951, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-24 | House | Act No. 68 |
2015-11-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-11-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-11-16 | House | Signed in House |
2015-11-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-11-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-11-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-09 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-28 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-19 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-10-14 | House | In the House |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |