PA SB79 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of January 17, 1968 (P.L.11, No.5), known as The Minimum Wage Act of 1968, further providing for definitions; providing for Federal compliance; and further providing for minimum wages and for exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions; providing for Federal compliance; and further providing for minimum wages and for exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 79 PN 1389, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-22HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2019-11-20HouseIn the House
2019-11-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (42-7)
2019-11-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-11-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-11-18SenateReported as amended
2019-01-23SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=79
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0079&pn=0054
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0079&pn=1389
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=637
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=663
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=345

Bill Comments

feedback