PA SB785 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in registration of vehicles, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration; and providing for operation of golf carts.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in registration of vehicles, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration; and providing for operation of golf carts.
Sponsors
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] |
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 785 PN 1239, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 785 PN 1239, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03797 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03783 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 785 PN 1092, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 785 PN 1239, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03797 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03783 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 785 PN 1092, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Senate | Act No. 57 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-10-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-10-18 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-09-21 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-09-18 | House | In the House |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |