PA SB782 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.
Title
In public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Amanda Cappelletti [D] |
Sen. Maria Collett [D] | Sen. Arthur Haywood [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02258 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |