PA SB780 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to telemedicine; authorizing the regulation of telemedicine by professional licensing boards; and providing for insurance coverage of telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to telemedicine; authorizing the regulation of telemedicine by professional licensing boards; and providing for insurance coverage of telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-11 - House - House Floor: SB 780 PN 1997, 2017 A9860, TOBASH (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A09268 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 780 PN 1852, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 780 PN 1709, A7424, VOGEL AMENDMENT NO. A-7424 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as amended
2018-06-19HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2018-06-13HouseIn the House
2018-06-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-13SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-11SenateSecond consideration, with amendments (49-0)
2018-06-06SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-06SenateLaid on the table
2018-04-24SenateAmended on second consideration
2018-04-17SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-17SenateLaid on the table
2018-01-30SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-30SenateReported as amended
2017-06-22SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=780
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0780&pn=1001
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0780&pn=1448
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0780&pn=1709
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0780&pn=1852
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0780&pn=1997
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=01/30/2018&RollCallId=657
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=536
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=557
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=958
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1890
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1539

Bill Comments

feedback