PA SB78 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child custody, further providing for definitions, for award of custody, for factors to consider when awarding custody, for consideration of criminal conviction, for guardian ad litem for child, for counsel for child and for award of counsel fees, costs and expenses; and, in Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts, providing for child abuse and domestic abuse education and training program for judges and court personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In child custody, further providing for definitions, for award of custody, for factors to consider when awarding custody, for consideration of criminal conviction, for guardian ad litem for child, for counsel for child and for award of counsel fees, costs and expenses; and, in Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts, providing for child abuse and domestic abuse education and training program for judges and court personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 78 PN 930, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 78 PN 65, 2021 A9940, BAKER Amendment No. A-0994 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 78 PN 65, Agree to the bill on Second Consideration (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-06-24HouseIn the House
2021-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-4)
2021-06-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-21SenateAmended on third consideration (50-0)
2021-06-14SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-14SenateLaid on the table
2021-05-10SenateRemoved from table
2021-05-10SenateLaid on the table
2021-03-16SenateRemoved from table
2021-03-16SenateLaid on the table
2021-02-22SenateSecond consideration, *Opening vote* Feb. 22, 2021 (47-0)
2021-01-25SenateFirst consideration
2021-01-25SenateReported as committed
2021-01-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=78
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0078&pn=0065
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0078&pn=0930
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0078P0930.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=01/25/2021&RollCallId=7
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=35
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=181
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=423
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=209

Bill Comments 750

feedback