PA SB78 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 7, 1982 (P.L.784, No.225), known as the Dog Law, further providing for definitions and for revocation or refusal of kennel licenses.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for revocation or refusal of kennel licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 78 PN 54, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2015-06-03 | House | In the House |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-05-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |