PA SB779 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for general primary and candidates to be nominated and party officers to be elected.
Title
In dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for general primary and candidates to be nominated and party officers to be elected.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 779 PN 1039, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-29 | House | In the House |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |