PA SB779 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for general primary and candidates to be nominated and party officers to be elected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for general primary and candidates to be nominated and party officers to be elected.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-11-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-11-18SenateReported as committed
2019-06-20SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback