PA SB777 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in inspection of vehicles, further providing for requirement for periodic inspection of vehicles.
Title
In inspection of vehicles, further providing for requirement for periodic inspection of vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 777 PN 917, Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-10-19 | House | In the House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-20) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |