PA SB775 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-24 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-24 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases; providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions; further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis, providing for request for modified DNA search; and further providing for DNA data base exchange, for expungement and for mandatory cost.
Title
In DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases; providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions; further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis, providing for request for modified DNA search; and further providing for DNA data base exchange, for expungement and for mandatory cost.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - SB 775 PN 2491, FP (Y: 177 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - SB 775 PN 2506, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 775 PN 2417, 2011 A13549, NEUMAN (Y: 132 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 775 PN 2417, 2011 A13491, WATERS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 775 PN 2417, 2011 A13537, NEUMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-12-06 - Senate - SB 775 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Senate - SB 775 PN 1602, COSTA AMENDMENT A-6733-RECONSIDERED (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-12-05 - Senate - SB 775 PN 1602, A6733, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-6733 (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-10-31 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - SB 775 PN 2506, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 775 PN 2417, 2011 A13549, NEUMAN (Y: 132 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 775 PN 2417, 2011 A13491, WATERS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - House - SB 775 PN 2417, 2011 A13537, NEUMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-12-06 - Senate - SB 775 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Senate - SB 775 PN 1602, COSTA AMENDMENT A-6733-RECONSIDERED (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-12-05 - Senate - SB 775 PN 1602, A6733, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-6733 (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-10-31 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-17 | House | In the House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (44-5) |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (177-14) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-12-07 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-12-06 | House | In the House |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-6) |
2011-12-05 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |