PA SB772 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 99 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 99 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in life insurance, further providing for standard nonforfeiture law for individual deferred annuities; and, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article, for duties of insurers and insurance producers, for insurance producer training, for mitigation of responsibility, for recordkeeping and for enforcement.
Title
In life insurance, further providing for standard nonforfeiture law for individual deferred annuities; and, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article, for duties of insurers and insurance producers, for insurance producer training, for mitigation of responsibility, for recordkeeping and for enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Sen. John Kane [D] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 1127, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: SB 772 PN 1127, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02179 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02186 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 912, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 1127, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: SB 772 PN 1127, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02179 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02186 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 912, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | Act No. 99 of 2021 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2021-11-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-08 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2021-06-25 | House | In the House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |