PA SB769 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for small wireless facilities deployment.
Title
Providing for small wireless facilities deployment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 769 PN 898, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 769 PN 898, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2021-06-22 | House | In the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |