PA SB766 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1996 (P.L.1478, No.190), entitled "An act relating to the recycling and reuse of waste tires; providing for the proper disposal of waste tires and the cleanup of stockpiled tires; authorizing investment tax credits for utilizing waste tires; providing remediation grants for the cleanup of tire piles and for pollution prevention programs for small business and households; establishing the Small Business and Household Pollution Prevention Program and management standards for small business hazardous waste; providing for a household hazardous waste program and for grant programs; making appropriations; and making repeals," in Small Business and Household Pollution Prevention Program, further providing for grants for collection events.
Title
Amending the act of December 19, 1996 (P.L.1478, No.190), entitled "An act relating to the recycling and reuse of waste tires; providing for the proper disposal of waste tires and the cleanup of stockpiled tires; authorizing investment tax credits for utilizing waste tires; providing remediation grants for the cleanup of tire piles and for pollution prevention programs for small business and households; establishing the Small Business and Household Pollution Prevention Program and management standards for small business hazardous waste; providing for a household hazardous waste program and for grant programs; making appropriations; and making repeals," in Small Business and Household Pollution Prevention Program, further providing for grants for collection events.
Sponsors
Sen. Daylin Leach [D] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |