PA SB763 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 27, 1966 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.31, No.1), known as The Bituminous Mine Subsidence and Land Conservation Act, further providing for compilation and analysis of data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for compilation and analysis of data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-08SenateRemoved from table
2020-09-08SenateLaid on the table
2020-06-22SenateRemoved from table
2020-06-22SenateLaid on the table
2020-04-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-21SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-25SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-25SenateReported as committed
2019-06-14SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback