PA SB762 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 25 (Elections) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration system, providing for audit of SURE system.
Title
In registration system, providing for audit of SURE system.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 762 PN 1588, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-27 | House | In the House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-12-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |