PA SB760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in Computer Data Center Equipment Incentive Program, further providing for definitions, for sales and use tax refund, for application for certification, for review of application, for eligibility requirements, for notification, for revocation of certification, repealing provisions relating to application and limitations and providing for exemption certificate.
Title
In Computer Data Center Equipment Incentive Program, further providing for definitions, for sales and use tax refund, for application for certification, for review of application, for eligibility requirements, for notification, for revocation of certification, repealing provisions relating to application and limitations and providing for exemption certificate.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] |
Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |