PA SB759 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19033, on that portion of northbound State Route 119 over State Route 286 in White Township, Indiana County, as the Specialist Five Timothy Rice Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19033, on that portion of northbound State Route 119 over State Route 286 in White Township, Indiana County, as the Specialist Five Timothy Rice Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 759 PN 936, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 759 PN 936, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-04 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-24 | House | In the House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |