PA SB753 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions relating to accidents and accident reports, further providing for accident scene clearance.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions relating to accidents and accident reports, further providing for accident scene clearance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |