PA SB750 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 2004 (P.L.1270, No.153), referred to as the Pennsylvania Amber Alert System Law, establishing the Pennsylvania Green Alert System; and further providing for immunity.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Green Alert System; and further providing for immunity.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |